Case: PD-0701-87
PD-0701-87
06/26/1987
PDR Case Type
BENNETT, DONALD WHITT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/22/1988 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
01/06/1988 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
07/28/1987 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
06/26/1987 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/01/1988 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BENNETT, DONALD WHITT | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Mike Gibson |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Dan Meehan |
Court of Appeals Information:
06-83-00022-CR
Aff 2-24-87
6th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
6th District Court
Fannin
Honorable Henry Braswell
16,440