judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. V. JOSEPH A. GIDDIS, ET AL

Case Information: 10-OA-0022
Short Caption:BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. V. JOSEPH A. GIDDIS, ET ALClassification:Original Jurisdiction - Original Actions - Mandamus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:08/27/2010

Opening Event Date:08/27/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBank of America, N.A.N
Robert I. SwainNN
Samantha E. ThompsonNY
Adrienne J. Lawrence NN
RespondentJoseph A. Giddis N
Todd S. KimNY
Stacy L. AndersonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/27/2010PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS Denied
08/27/2010FILING FEE of $100.00
08/30/2010TMC - petition for writ of mandamus - response
10/05/2010 ORDERED that RESPONDENTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE to the PWM W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the PWM IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of the court. (RDKRNB) (jl)
10/22/2010RESP MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE(d.c.) to 11/24/10
10/22/2010PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to respondent's motion for extension of time to respond to petition for writ of mandamus
10/25/2010 ORDERED that RESPONDENT'S MOTION IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that RESPONDENTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE to the PWM NO LATER THAN November 12, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the PWM SHALL REMAIN HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of the court. (RDKRTE) (jl)
10/25/2010RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to petitioner's opposition to their request for an extension of time to respond to peition for writ of mandamus
11/12/2010RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to writ of mandamus
11/16/2010FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/16/2010 ORDERED that the PWM IS DENIED in part because petitioner has an alternative means of relief; namely appealing the decision of the Contracting Officer to the Contract Appeals Board. (RDKRNB) (jl)
02/01/2011RECEIVED - aplt's motion to with draw & notice of appearance of Samantha Thompson
04/26/2011APPEARANCE- of Adrienne J. Lawrence on behalf of aplt