Case Information: 38180 | |||
Short Caption: | SCHIRO (KENNETH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 32590 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C120111 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/07/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/17/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/17/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-12102 | |
08/13/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38096/38173/38180/38202/38203. | 01-13676 | |
12/07/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 14. | 01-20629 | |
12/07/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/28/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn5[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-11125 | |
09/11/2002 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered appellant's petition]. NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-15685 | |
10/08/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-15938 | |
10/08/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/21/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 10, 2002. | 02-15938 |