judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Oscar Rene Arevalo v. Gabrielle Fink

Case: 01-19-00822-CV
01-19-00822-CV
10/23/2019
Divorce
Oscar Rene Arevalo
Gabrielle Fink
No
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
03/26/2020Reply brief filedAppellant
02/26/2020Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/02/2020Supplemental brief filedAppellant
11/25/2019Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
12/11/2020Mandate issued
10/14/2020Motion for rehearing was not filed
10/14/2020Motion for rehearing due
09/29/2020Memorandum opinion issuedAffirm TC judgment in part, reverse TC judgment in part, and remand case to TC for further proceedings
09/29/2020Judgment Issued
09/08/2020Submitted
08/04/2020Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
07/09/2020Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/09/2020Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/04/2020Case ready to be set
04/06/2020Response due
03/26/2020Reply brief filed
03/26/2020Notice of late brief
02/27/2020Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/26/2020Brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/26/2020Appellees brief due
02/26/2020Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/25/2020Appellees brief due
01/13/2020Document returned
01/02/2020Supplemental brief filed
01/02/2020Motion to file supplemental brief filed
01/01/2020Deadline to conduct mediation
12/27/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion in part and deny motion in part
12/27/2019Appellees brief due
12/23/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/16/2019Response due
12/14/2019Mediation set to be conducted
12/10/2019Order enteredIssue sua sponte order
12/10/2019Indigent status for costs of appeal confirmed
12/09/2019Document returned
12/09/2019Document returned
12/09/2019Appellants brief due
12/02/2019Document returned
12/02/2019Deadline for parties to select mediator
11/25/2019Brief filed - oral argument requested
11/18/2019Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals
11/15/2019Order enteredMediation
11/14/2019Past due court fee notice
11/13/2019Court fee due
11/13/2019Docketing statement due
11/07/2019Letter filed
11/07/2019Reporters record filed
11/05/2019Docketing statement filed
11/05/2019Clerks record filed
11/05/2019Appearance of counsel
11/05/2019Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/05/2019Record due
10/23/2019Case began in court of appeals
10/23/2019Notice of appeal received
10/21/2019Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed
10/21/2019Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the trial court
10/21/2019Notice of appeal filed in trial court
09/06/2019Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/11/2020Case StoredCase stored
12/11/2026RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fink, Gabriele AppelleeThomas Pehl Nixon
Gabriele Fink
Attorney General AppelleeDeterrean Gamble
Arevalo, Oscar ReneAppellantMark Aronowitz
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Galveston
Honorable Judge County Court @ Law #1
18-FD-0450
Lynnette Erskine