judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7527
A-7527
09/14/1959
Application for Writ of Error
MISSOURI PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
WILLIAM KIMBRELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/14/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/13/1960Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/05/1960Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/01/1960Response to Brief filedPetitioner
01/25/1960Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
10/14/1959Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/01/1959Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/29/1959Response to PetitionPetitioner
09/14/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
09/14/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
09/14/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/14/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/13/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/30/1960Opinion issued
02/05/1960Response to Brief filed
02/01/1960Response to Brief filed
01/25/1960Supplemental Brief filed
11/11/1959Document received (See Remarks)
11/11/1959Document received (See Remarks)
11/11/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/14/1959Response to Brief filed
10/01/1959Reply to Response
09/29/1959Response to Petition
09/14/1959Response to Petition
09/14/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/14/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/14/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William KimbrellRespondent
Missouri Pacific Railroad CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information