Case Information: 34824 | |||
Short Caption: | PHILLIPS VS. STATE, WELFARE DIVISION | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lander Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 8766 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/09/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/14/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
09/14/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-08664 | |
10/25/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 99-10454 | |
11/09/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 11/05/99. | 99-11022 | |
11/09/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/21/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Requesting Document. Appellant filed a motion for leave to appear in forma pauperis with the district court on September 13, 1999. We direct the clerk of the district court to transmit a copy of the order resolving appellant's motion within 30 days of the date of this order or to inform this court of the status of the motion, including an estimated date by which it may be resolved. | 00-01020 | |
01/27/2000 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. copy of order filed in district court on January 25, 2000, granting in forma pauperis status. | 00-01347 | |
01/27/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/15/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-04126 | |
04/11/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-05752 | |
04/11/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/18/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 13, 2000. | 00-05752 |