judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM JOHN WILLIAMS, APRIL WILLIAMS, TIMOTHY WILLIAMS, CHRISTINA WILLIAMS, JESSICA WILLIAMS, and LORI WILLIAMS v. ERIC PETH, KURT PETH, and PAT MEDINGER

Case Heading (06-257)
Case Number:06-257Case Docketed On:11/07/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:WILLIAM JOHN WILLIAMS, APRIL WILLIAMS, TIMOTHY WILLIAMS, CHRISTINA WILLIAMS, JESSICA WILLIAMS, and LORI WILLIAMS v. ERIC PETH, KURT PETH, and PAT MEDINGER
Full Title:WILLIAM JOHN WILLIAMS, APRIL WILLIAMS, TIMOTHY WILLIAMS, CHRISTINA WILLIAMS, JESSICA WILLIAMS, and LORI WILLIAMS, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. ERIC PETH, KURT PETH, and PAT MEDINGER, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam John WilliamsJohn H. Robinson
Timothy W. Miller
AppellantApril WilliamsJohn H. Robinson
Timothy W. Miller
AppellantTimothy WilliamsJohn H. Robinson
Timothy W. Miller
AppellantChristina WilliamsJohn H. Robinson
Timothy W. Miller
AppellantJessica WilliamsJohn H. Robinson
Timothy W. Miller
AppellantLori WilliamsJohn H. Robinson
Timothy W. Miller
AppelleeEric PethPatrick J. Murphy
AppelleeKurt PethPatrick J. Murphy
AppelleePat MedingerPatrick J. Murphy

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/07/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/07/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/14/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/15/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/03/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
04/04/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
04/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal