judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY KEVIN GLENMORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1034
Short Caption:ANTHONY KEVIN GLENMORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-6201-09Filed Date:08/17/2010

Opening Event Date:08/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:03/17/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/22/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony K. Glenmore Y
Bruce A. Johnson, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Angela Pegram Saffoe YN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Bruce Johnson, Jr., Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Bruce Johnson, Jr., Esquire
09/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
09/15/2010RECEIVED- motion for appeal transcripts
11/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (151 pgs/Hill) 5/24/10 proc.
11/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (164 pgs/Hill) 5/25/10 proc.
11/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (68 pgs/Hill) 5/26/10 proc.
11/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (7 pgs/Hill) 5/27/10 proc.
11/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (16 pgs/tape) 8/9/10 proc. w/cd
11/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/18/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/29/2010RECORD INDEX
11/29/2010RECORD COPIES
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
12/28/2010APPENDIX
01/26/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
02/03/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before February 28, 2011. (JAC)
02/28/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/21/11 no oppo
03/07/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 21, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
03/17/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/17/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/17/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD no oppo
03/23/2011 On consideration of the unopposed motion of appellee to supplement the record with the lodged document that was part of the record in the trial court, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged document will be forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for transmittal to this court as a supplemental record. (JAC)
03/24/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (proposed jury instruc- tions)
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/05/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
08/24/2011FiledOrder Denying motion for oral argument. (JAC)
09/22/2011FiledSubmitted To Ruiz,Oberly,King
10/06/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly, Associate Judge, and ruiz, Associate Judge, retired, and King, Senior Judge)
10/28/2011FiledMandate
11/30/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for reh/reh en banc
03/13/2012FiledMandate