judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

A. M. FERGUSON, ADMINISTRATOR, ET AL. v. JOE LEE FERGUSON, ET AL.

Case: A-311
A-311
08/14/1944
Application for Writ of Error
A. M. FERGUSON, ADMINISTRATOR, ET AL.
JOE LEE FERGUSON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/21/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/26/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/09/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
10/02/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/14/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/21/1944Motion for Rehearing
10/26/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/09/1944Response to Petition
10/02/1944Brief in Support of Petition
08/14/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
08/14/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joe Lee Ferguson, et al.Respondent
A. M. Ferguson, Administrator, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information