Case: 14-19-00631-CV
14-19-00631-CV
08/20/2019
Miscellaneous/other civil
Ronald Scott Catt
Christopher Delozier, John Healey, Jr., Troy Nehls, and Bradley Wichard
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/16/2019 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
11/25/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
10/25/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/12/2021 | Submitted | | |||||
01/11/2021 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
10/14/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
10/12/2020 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
08/31/2020 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
12/16/2019 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
12/05/2019 | Motion for judicial notice disposed | DENIED |
| ||||
12/02/2019 | Supplemental clerks record due | | |||||
11/26/2019 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
11/25/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
11/25/2019 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/25/2019 | Order entered |
| |||||
11/25/2019 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
10/25/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
10/25/2019 | Motion for judicial notice filed |
| |||||
10/25/2019 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/22/2019 | Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals |
| |||||
10/22/2019 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
10/22/2019 | Response filed |
| |||||
10/22/2019 | Affidavit filed |
| |||||
10/08/2019 | Response due | | |||||
09/26/2019 | Dismissal letter |
| |||||
09/26/2019 | Clerks record due | | |||||
09/26/2019 | Record due | | |||||
09/25/2019 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
09/04/2019 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
09/04/2019 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||
08/30/2019 | Court fee due | | |||||
08/23/2019 | Notification received that no record was taken | | |||||
08/23/2019 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
08/20/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
08/20/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
08/20/2019 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
08/19/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
05/31/2019 | Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed | | |||||
05/29/2019 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/12/2021 | Submitted | Submitted on briefs |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Christopher Delozier, John Healey, Jr., Troy Nehls, and Bradley Wichard | Appellee | Ruhee Leonard Salvatore P. LoPiccolo |
Catt, Ronald Scott | Appellant | Ronald Scott Catt |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law #4
Fort Bend
Honorable Judge, County Court At Law #4
19-CCV-064867
Court Reporter, County Court At Law #4