judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7536
A-7536
09/16/1959
Application for Writ of Error
A.J. TEBBE AND SONS COMPANY
BROWN EXPRESS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/08/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/01/1960Supplement to ResponseRespondent
10/08/1959Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/30/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
09/16/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/12/1960Response to Motion filed
12/08/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/23/1960Dissenting opinion issued.
11/23/1960Opinion issued
02/01/1960Supplement to Response
12/09/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/08/1959Reply to Response
09/30/1959Response to Petition
09/16/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/16/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brown ExpressRespondent
A.J. Tebbe and Sons CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information