Case: 20-0763
20-0763
09/29/2020
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
BRIAN POTASHNIK, SOUTHWEST HOUSING DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., SOUTHWEST HOUSING MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, INC. A/K/A AND D/B/A SOUTHWEST HOUSING MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC., AND AFFORDABLE HOUSING CONSTRUCTION, INC.
JEFFREY W. CARPENTER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/28/2021 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Brian Potashnik, et al. |
| ||||
12/10/2020 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Brian Potashnik, et al. | |||||
12/06/2020 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jeffrey W. Carpenter. | |||||
09/29/2020 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Brian Potashnik, et al. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/2021 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
03/05/2021 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
02/02/2021 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
01/28/2021 | Motion for Rehearing | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Brian Potashnik, et al. |
| |||||
01/22/2021 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
12/10/2020 | Reply to Response | Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Brian Potashnik, et al. | ||||||
12/06/2020 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jeffrey W. Carpenter. | ||||||
11/06/2020 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than December 6, 2020. |
| |||||
10/06/2020 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
09/29/2020 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Jeffrey Carpenter. | ||||||
09/29/2020 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Brian Potashnik, et al. |
| |||||
09/29/2020 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
09/29/2020 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
09/29/2020 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
09/29/2020 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/05/2021 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Affordable Housing Construction, Inc. | Petitioner | Mr. Jason Friedman Mr. Lawrence J. Friedman Mr. Michael D. Donohue Mr. Robert B. Gilbreath |
Brian Potashnik | Petitioner | Mr. Jason Friedman Mr. Michael D. Donohue Mr. Robert B. Gilbreath Mr. Lawrence J. Friedman |
Carpenter, Jeffrey W. | Respondent | Ms. Amy Gibson Mr. David Linwayne Wiley |
Southwest Housing Management Corporation | Petitioner | Mr. Lawrence J. Friedman Mr. Robert B. Gilbreath Mr. Michael D. Donohue Mr. Jason Friedman |
Southwest Housing Development Company, Inc. | Petitioner | Mr. Jason Friedman Mr. Michael D. Donohue Mr. Robert B. Gilbreath Mr. Lawrence J. Friedman |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-19-00238-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 08-27-20
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable David W. Evans
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 5
Dallas
Honorable Mark B. Greenberg
CC-08-02072-E