judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4808
B-4808
08/01/1974
Application for Writ of Error
TOM ROTELLO, ET AL.
BRAZOS COUNTY WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NUMBER 1, BIG CREEK, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/16/1974Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/05/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/06/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
08/01/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/17/1974Response to Motion filed
12/16/1974Brief in Support of Petition
12/16/1974Motion to dismissOverruled
12/16/1974Miscellaneous Motion
12/05/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/06/1974Response to Petition
08/01/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/01/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brazos County Water Control and Improvement District Number 1, Big Creek, et al.Respondent
Tom Rotello, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information