judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7753
A-7753
03/03/1960
Application for Writ of Error
BARRON KIDD
PIERCE A. HOGGETT, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/12/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/31/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/17/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
03/03/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/16/1960Response to Motion filed
05/12/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/31/1960Reply to Response
03/17/1960Response to Petition
03/03/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/03/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pierce A. Hoggett, et ux.Respondent
Barron KiddPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information