judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7763
A-7763
03/09/1960
Application for Writ of Error
H. B. GOLDSMITH, ET AL.
G. R. CATHEY, COUNTY JUDGE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/12/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/04/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/24/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
03/09/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/13/1960Response to Motion filed
05/12/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/04/1960Reply to Response
03/24/1960Response to Petition
03/09/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/09/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. B. Goldsmith, et al.Petitioner
G. R. Cathey, County Judge, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information