judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES TYLER V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CV-1051
Short Caption:JAMES TYLER V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6917-08Filed Date:08/19/2010

Opening Event Date:08/19/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Tyler NPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 19, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/23/2010RECORD INDEX
09/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/27/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
10/20/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF no appendx
10/29/2010APPENDIX
11/16/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 14 days.
12/03/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before December 3, 2010. (JAC) elp
12/03/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/06/2010TMC - motion for summary affiramance - opposition
12/22/2010APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for summary affirmance
02/02/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgm't Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc., 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)... SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
02/02/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal be and HEREBY IS AFFIRMED. (RZFIKG) (kt)
02/17/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of order dated 2/2/11
02/22/2011TMC - motion for reconsideration
02/24/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. (RZFIKG) (kt)
03/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED
03/15/2011RECEIVED - Petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (returned, mandate has been issued)
10/11/2011FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari on October 3, 2011.(Appellant)Denied