judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCKEEHAN (BRETT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38158
Short Caption:MCKEEHAN (BRETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48919 , 52216 , 59424
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFP007905Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/03/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11762
07/19/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/5/01 and 6/12/01. To Court Reporter: Christian Knox. 01-12298
07/25/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12618
08/13/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/5/01 and 6/12/01. Court Reporter: Tia H. Lange. 01-13733
10/29/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 10, 2001. 01-18082
12/12/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/07/01. 01-20867
12/12/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-20868
01/09/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 24, 2001, respondent submitted a "Fast Track Response." This appeal is not subject to NRAP 3C. We direct the clerk to return, unfiled, the "Fast Track response" received on December 24, 2001. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief that complies with NRAP 28. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in compliance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-00602
01/09/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Elko County District Attorney. Returned unfiled, the original Fast Track Response received on December 24, 2001.
02/11/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/08/02. Signed by: Robert J. Lowe. 02-02659
03/01/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 2/27/02. Signed by Frederick B. Lee, Jr. 02-03805
04/03/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-05911
04/03/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/03/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-07835
05/28/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08003
05/28/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/03/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 30, 2002. 02-08003