judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CREDITORS COOPERATIVE CITRUS PROPERTIES v. HON. SIDNEY LATHAM, SECRETARY OF STATE, STATE OF TEXAS

Case: A-297
A-297
08/03/1944
MISC PETITION
CREDITORS COOPERATIVE CITRUS PROPERTIES
HON. SIDNEY LATHAM, SECRETARY OF STATE, STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/24/1945Motion for RehearingRelator
12/30/1944Reply to ResponseRelator
12/30/1944Response to Brief filedRelator
12/12/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/28/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
10/24/1944Motion for RehearingRelator
08/03/1944Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
08/03/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/24/1945Motion for Rehearing
01/11/1945Letter Filed
12/30/1944Reply to Response
12/30/1944Response to Brief filed
12/12/1944Brief on the Merits
12/12/1944Response to Motion filed
10/28/1944Brief in Support of Petition
10/28/1944Motion to Argue filed
10/25/1944Motion to Amend Filed
10/24/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/03/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
08/03/1944Brief in Support of Petition
08/03/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. Sidney Latham, Secretary of State, State of TexasRespondent
Creditors Cooperative Citrus PropertiesRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information