judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7774
A-7774
03/16/1960
MISC PETITION
ROY R. GARDNER
CHRISTIE, MITCHELL AND MITCHELL COMPANY, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/30/1960Motion for RehearingRelator
03/29/1960Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/24/1960Supplemental Brief filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/04/1960Response to Motion filed
04/04/1960Response to Motion filed
03/30/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/29/1960Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/24/1960Supplemental Brief filed
03/22/1960Response to Motion filed
03/16/1960Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Christie, Mitchell and Mitchell CompanyRespondent
Tennessee Gas Transmission CompanyAmicus Curiae
Railroad Commission of TexasRespondent
Roy R. GardnerRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information