judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: AP-70,883
AP-70,883
06/28/1989
Appeal Case Type
MOODY, JOHN GLENN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/02/1991BRIEF FILEDState
12/10/1990BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/2001ARCHIVED
01/11/1999EXECUTED
10/26/1998EXECUTION DATE SET
10/13/1992WRIT OF CERT USSCDENIED
05/26/1992WRIT OF CERT USSCFiled
05/14/1992Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
05/14/1992MANDATE ISSD
02/12/1992REHEAR DISPDENIED
02/12/1992REHEAR DISPDENIED
02/12/1992STAY MANDAT MOT TOGranted
02/03/1992STAY MANDAT MOT TOFiled
01/30/1992REHEAR FILED DP
01/30/1992REHEAR FILED
01/15/1992OPINION ISSDAffirmed
01/15/1992OPINION ISSDAffirmed
06/27/1991Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
06/27/1991SUBMITTED
06/17/1991MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENTGranted
06/17/1991MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENTGranted
05/02/1991Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
05/02/1991BRIEF FILED
05/02/1991SET FOR SUBMIS DP
03/12/1991EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
03/12/1991EXT BRIEF FILED
01/30/1991SUPP RECORD MOT TOGranted
01/29/1991SUPP RECORD MOT TOFiled
12/20/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
12/20/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
12/10/1990BRIEF FILED
09/13/1990EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
09/12/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
06/01/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
05/31/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
03/30/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
03/30/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
01/22/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
01/22/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
12/21/1989TR & SF FILED
12/13/1989EXT SF DISPGranted
12/13/1989EXT SF FILED
10/12/1989EXT SF DISPGranted
10/12/1989EXT SF FILED
06/28/1989DP BEGIN
06/28/1989EXT SF DISPGranted
06/28/1989EXT SF FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/02/2001STOREDARCHIVED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJames Eidson
Moody, John GlennApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Stan Brown
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
350th District Court
Taylor
Honorable Jorge A. Solis
1220-D