judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Lawrence Mireles v. The State of Texas

Case: 13-14-00636-CR
13-14-00636-CR
10/30/2014
Murder
Lawrence Mireles
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/22/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/29/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/02/2017Letter filed
08/05/2016Case stored
08/03/2016Record checked in
08/02/2016Record checked out
05/31/2016Letter issued by the court
05/31/2016Letter received
05/13/2016Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk
05/12/2016Mandate issued
05/05/2016Notice received
04/07/2016Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
02/11/2016Case forwarded to higher court
01/27/2016Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
01/15/2016Letter filed
12/29/2015Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
12/23/2015Submitted
12/02/2015Set for submission on briefs
11/05/2015Motion disposedGrant motion
10/26/2015Certificate of service filed
10/26/2015Motion to amend filed
10/22/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/19/2015Corrected document requested
10/19/2015Supplemental clerks record filed
09/29/2015Case ready to be set
09/29/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/19/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
08/10/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/15/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
06/10/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/05/2015Exhibits filed
06/04/2015Telephone call received
06/03/2015Telephone inquiry to or from the court
06/02/2015Exhibits filed
05/27/2015Telephone call received
05/20/2015Telephone inquiry to or from the court
05/12/2015Corrected document requested
05/12/2015Corrected document requested
05/12/2015Reporters record filed
05/07/2015Telephone inquiry to or from the court
04/29/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
04/29/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed
04/28/2015Telephone call received
04/27/2015Telephone inquiry to or from the court
04/16/2015Supplemental clerks record filed
04/07/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
04/06/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed
04/02/2015Telephone call received
02/20/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
02/20/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed
02/03/2015No reporters record filed in criminal case
01/28/2015Clerks record filed
10/30/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
10/27/2014Notice of appeal filed in trial court
10/27/2014Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
10/01/2014Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/12/2016RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
05/13/2016Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Mark Skurka
Hon. Douglas K. Norman
Mireles, Lawrence Criminal - AppellantMr. Lawrence Mireles
Hon. Randall E. Pretzer
Trial Court Information
319th District Court
Nueces
Honorable David Stith
12-CR-2269-G
Esther Natividad
60 YRS TDCJ; $10,000 fine; $249 court costs