judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00778-CV
05-89-00778-CV
06/28/1989
Contract
Trans-Texas Energy, Inc.
Minstrel Management Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/27/1997Record RetentionDestroy
06/29/1990Mandate Issued
06/29/1990Mandate Issued
05/07/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
05/07/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
05/04/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/25/1990Letter Sent by the Court
03/22/1990Letter Filed
03/15/1990Letter Sent by the Court
03/05/1990Letter Filed
02/07/1990Submitted
02/07/1990Submission
12/21/1989MattConv
09/28/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
09/25/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
09/14/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/14/1989Mot Ext Time Sup Sfacts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1989Response to Motion
08/30/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans
08/30/1989Mot Ext Time File Sup Sfacts
08/22/1989Brief Filed
08/22/1989Case ready to be set
08/22/1989Case ready to be set
07/28/1989Brief Filed
06/28/1989MattConv
06/28/1989Statement of Facts Filed
06/28/1989Transcript Filed
06/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/07/1989Appeal Bond Filed
03/13/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
193rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
86-13685-L