judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00219-CR
08-89-00219-CR
06/28/1989
All Misdemeanors
The State of Texas
Watson, Robert
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/22/1991Mandate Issued
04/22/1991Shuck purged
04/22/1991Mandate Issued
01/23/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/23/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1991Submitted
01/10/1991Submission
01/10/1991Submitted
12/06/1990Filed waiver of oral argument
11/29/1990Submission
10/11/1990Fee paid
07/20/1990Payment of fee due requested
05/25/1990Payment of fee due requested
05/23/1990Brief Filed
05/23/1990Case ready to be set
05/23/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/23/1990Case ready to be set
05/07/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/26/1990Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
01/31/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/20/1989Brief Filed
12/20/1989Filed waiver of oral argument
12/20/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/04/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/16/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
11/15/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/03/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
10/13/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
09/27/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/31/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
07/26/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/26/1989Transcript Filed
06/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/22/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. Mark D. Owens
UnknownAppellantHon. Tracey Scown
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Ector
L89-925-A