judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00218-CR
08-89-00218-CR
06/28/1989
Criminal Mandamus
The State of Texas
The Honorable Robert Galvan, Judge, County Court at Law #1
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/19/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
07/19/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
07/19/1989Case ready to be set
07/14/1989Submitted
07/14/1989Submission
07/14/1989Submitted
07/11/1989Miscellaneous filing
07/11/1989Miscellaneous filing
07/10/1989Brief Filed
06/28/1989Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus
06/28/1989Motion for leave to * filed
06/28/1989Motion for leave to file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/28/1989Order entered
06/28/1989Order entered
06/28/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
06/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/25/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownRelatorHon. Herbert M. Flemming
UnknownRespondentHon. Robert Galvan
UnknownRespondentHon. Michael R. Gibson
Trial Court Information