Case Information: 38157 | |||
Short Caption: | EURITT (JERRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR000823 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/27/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/11/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/11/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-11761 | |
07/24/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 01-12537 | |
07/27/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 01-12729 | |
07/27/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/07/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB | 01-13319 | |
10/08/2001 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB | 01-16823 | |
10/24/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-16932 | |
10/24/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/01/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2001. | 01-16932 |