judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DALE ANTONIO MARTIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1050
Short Caption:DALE ANTONIO MARTIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD3820-10Filed Date:08/20/2010

Opening Event Date:08/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/22/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/09/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDale Antonio Martin Y
T. Gail Maddox-LevineYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent apepllant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk. (By: JAC)
09/07/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire
10/15/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 7, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so.(Castillo)
10/21/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo)
10/21/2010RECEIVED - statement regarding transcripts
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (82pgs/Tape) 7/23/10 proc. w/CD
10/22/2010RECORD INDEX
10/22/2010RECORD COPIES
10/22/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/02/2010ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURHTER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the doucments required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
11/02/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
12/06/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 1/12/11 (unopposed)
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 12, 2011. (By: JAC)
12/29/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/29/2010APPENDIX
02/02/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/03/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - appellant's brief/appendix
02/11/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY - to aple's motion for summary affirmance
03/11/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc., 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
03/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is HEREBY AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE) (rf)
03/16/2011APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING until April 30, 2011
03/21/2011ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH on or before May 2, 2011. (WH)
05/09/2011MANDATE ISSUED