judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ROBERT HONEA, BY NEXT FRIEND v. COCA-COLA BOTTLING COMPANY

Case: A-296
A-296
08/03/1944
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT HONEA, BY NEXT FRIEND
COCA-COLA BOTTLING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/13/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/15/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
08/12/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
08/03/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/13/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/15/1944Supplemental Brief filed
10/11/1944Document received (See Remarks)
08/12/1944Response to Petition
08/03/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/03/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
COCA-COLA BOTTLING COMPANYRespondent
Robert Honea, by Next FriendPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information