judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00255-CR
13-89-00255-CR
06/28/1989
Assault & battery
Crossman, Matthew Joseph
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1991Cite for opinions
10/31/1990Mandate Issued
09/13/1990Opinion issuedReversed, Remanded in part & Affirmed in part
04/25/1990Submitted
04/25/1990Submission
04/11/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
03/22/1990Brief Filed
03/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/06/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
03/05/1990Submission
02/20/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/26/1990Brief Filed
01/26/1990Case ready to be set
01/11/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/29/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/30/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/18/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
10/18/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/1989Due date for record to be filed
07/21/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/18/1989Transcript Filed
06/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
332nd District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Mario Efrain Ramirez
CR-528-88-F
25 yrs tdc