judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-89-00166-CV
12-89-00166-CV
06/29/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Callaway, Edwin K., et ux
Gary, Alton, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
06/11/1991
06/07/1991Mandate Issued
05/22/1991
05/07/1991
04/22/1991Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/22/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/27/1991Motion for Leave to File DisposedOverruled
03/27/1991Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
03/15/1991Motion for Leave to File
10/04/1990Disposition of MotionOverruled
10/04/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/18/1990No Description Available.
08/28/1990Submission
09/07/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/07/1989Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Affidavit Filed.
08/29/1989
08/24/1989Letter from the Court
08/21/1989Brief Filed
08/21/1989Case ready to be set
08/17/1989No Description Available.
07/28/1989Brief Filed
07/05/1989
06/29/1989No Description Available.
06/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/30/1989Surety Bond Filed
04/03/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
03/08/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gary, Alton AltonAppellee
Callaway, Edwin K.AppellantJudge Carter W. Tarrance
Gary, AltonAppellee
Trial Court Information
173rd District Court
Henderson
Honorable Randall Lee Rogers
87A-12