judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00662-CR
01-89-00662-CR
06/28/1989
Burglary
Childress, Tony Ray
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/23/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/21/1990Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
11/21/1990Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
09/12/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
08/31/1990Date final opinion release for publication
08/30/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
08/17/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
08/02/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/02/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/1990Submitted
06/20/1990Submission
06/20/1990Submitted
05/15/1990Submission
03/29/1990Submission
03/15/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
03/15/1990Case ready to be set
03/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/15/1990Case ready to be set
03/05/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/08/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/08/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/26/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/10/1990Brief due for retained counsel
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
12/07/1989Statement of facts filed
11/20/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
11/18/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
11/16/1989Brief due for retained counsel
10/11/1989Transcript filed
06/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/19/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantWalter Boyd
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
483,843
85 yrs tdc & $10,000 fine