judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00149-CV
02-89-00149-CV
06/28/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Fogel,Ltd.A.T.,Federal Group I, & Interntl.Property Mgmt.Inc
Shoemake,Janet, Indiv. & As Admin. of the Est of M. Gilley
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/29/1992Mandate Issued
04/29/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/26/1992Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals Reversed & Judg Trial Ct Affirmd
02/06/1991Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/08/1990Writ Filed
10/09/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/02/1990Response Filed
09/19/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/04/1990Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
02/13/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
01/30/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
01/16/1990Submitted
01/16/1990Submission
01/15/1990Letter Brief Filed
01/15/1990Order Entered
11/13/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
10/02/1989Brief Filed
09/05/1989Brief Filed
08/04/1989No Description Available.
08/04/1989Submission
06/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
International Property Mgmt.Appellant
Gilley, WayneAppellee
Fogel, Ltd. A.t.Appellant
Hummel, WilliamAppellee
Federal Group IAppellant
Fogel, Danny L. Indiv.Appellant
Shoemake, Janet. Indiv.Appellee
Fogel, Danny L. C.c.i.m. Inc.Appellant
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court
Tarrant
153-97096-86