judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00307-CV
04-89-00307-CV
06/29/1989
Contract
Industrial Indemnity Company
MMR Constructors, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/08/1990Original Exhibits Returned
03/08/1990Mandate Issued
03/08/1990Mandate Issued
01/19/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/1990Verification Filed
01/04/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/13/1989No Description Available.
12/13/1989Exhibits Filed
09/13/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
09/07/1989Response to Motion Filed
08/30/1989No Description Available.
07/19/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/07/1989No Description Available.
06/29/1989No Description Available.
06/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/07/1989Appeal Bond Filed
03/09/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
37th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable J. T. Brite
85-CI-12836
n/a