judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION VS. DIST. CT. (CARTER)

Case Information: 38156
Short Caption:CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION VS. DIST. CT. (CARTER)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0005728Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/11/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 01-11757
07/11/2001Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. 01-11758
07/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-12719
08/22/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 01-14269
12/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. 01-21786
03/15/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition denied." fn14[From the record before us, it is unclear whether the district court intended to order Carter to amend the petition to join the City of Reno in lieu of dismissing the petition. We note that the City of Reno is an indispensable party and must be joinded before the merits of the petition can be heard.] 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 20. NNP02 02-04703
04/09/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 02-04848
04/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.