judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00306-CV
04-89-00306-CV
06/29/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Patricia A. Bradley
Texas Employment Commission &Southwestern Bell Telephone Co.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/18/1990Original Exhibits Returned
12/17/1990Mandate Issued
12/17/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
12/17/1990Mandate Issued
11/14/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
09/16/1990Information regarding cause received
08/03/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/18/1990Writ of Error filed
06/18/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/09/1990Response to Motion Filed
05/03/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/04/1990Submitted
01/04/1990Submission
01/04/1990Submitted
11/27/1989Submission
09/05/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/05/1989Brief Filed
09/05/1989Brief Filed
09/05/1989Case ready to be set
09/05/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/05/1989Case ready to be set
08/28/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/1989Verification Filed
08/15/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/10/1989Requests Oral Argument
08/10/1989Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
08/10/1989Brief Filed
07/10/1989Exhibits Filed
07/10/1989No Description Available.
06/29/1989No Description Available.
06/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/14/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/15/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/17/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
166th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable John Cornyn
87-CI-21736
n/a