Case: 04-16-00772-CV
04-16-00772-CV
11/29/2016
Injunction
Mandy Pilgrim, Stacy A. Keller-Lassater, Nefi Miramontes, and Stephanie Trevino-Lozano
First American Title Co., LLC and First American Title Insurance Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/14/2017 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
04/05/2017 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/05/2017 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
04/05/2017 | Submitted | | |||||
04/05/2017 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
03/19/2017 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
03/16/2017 | Order entered |
| |||||
03/06/2017 | Internal memo | | |||||
02/13/2017 | Prescreened | | |||||
12/21/2016 | Order entered |
| |||||
12/21/2016 | Motion to abate appeal disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
12/21/2016 | Mediation set to be conducted |
| |||||
12/16/2016 | Motion to abate appeal filed |
| |||||
12/14/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
12/13/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||
12/09/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||
12/09/2016 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
12/08/2016 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
12/08/2016 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
12/08/2016 | Internal memo | | |||||
12/07/2016 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
12/06/2016 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
11/29/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
11/29/2016 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
11/28/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
11/08/2016 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/14/2017 | Case Stored | Case stored |
06/14/2023 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Miramontes, Nefi | Appellant | Beth Watkins Stephanie De Sola Shannon K. Dunn |
First American Title Insurance Company | Appellee | |
Pilgrim, Mandy | Appellant | Shannon K. Dunn Frank Herrera, Jr. Beth Watkins Stephanie De Sola |
Keller-Lassater, Stacy A. | Appellant | Beth Watkins Shannon K. Dunn Stephanie De Sola Frank Herrera, Jr. |
Tevino-Lozano, Stephanie | Appellant | Stephanie De Sola Frank Herrera, Jr. Beth Watkins Shannon K. Dunn |
First American Title Company, LLC | Appellee | John Duke William Engler Hammel |
Trial Court Information
225th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Cathleen M. Stryker
2016-CI-15145
Maria E. Mary Helen Vargas