judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00658-CR
01-89-00658-CR
06/28/1989
Robbery
Hernandez, Jorge Caro aka Cecilio Hernandez
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/08/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/08/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
02/08/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
02/08/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/12/1990Motion to withdraw appeal
12/21/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
12/21/1989Statement of facts filed
12/11/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
11/09/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/26/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/07/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
08/25/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
08/18/1989Transcript filed
06/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/27/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
06/27/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantRenato Santos Jr.
StateCriminal - AppellantRosemary Savcillo
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
Honorable LUPE SALINAS
509,434
5 years tdc