judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7368
A-7368
06/02/1959
Application for Writ of Error
R. A. WILBANKS, ET AL.
WILLIAM A. WILBANKS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/25/1959Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/17/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
06/02/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/06/1960Opinion issued
07/15/1959Document received (See Remarks)
06/25/1959Reply to Response
06/17/1959Response to Petition
06/02/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/02/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William A. WilbanksRespondent
R. A. Wilbanks, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information