judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7355
A-7355
05/22/1959
MISC PETITION
ATLANTIC REFINING COMPANY, ET AL.
BRIGHT AND SCHIFF, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, BRIGHT AND SCHIFF, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/09/1961Motion for Rehearing
05/15/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/09/1961Response to Brief filed
05/03/1961Brief in Support of Petition
05/01/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/21/1961Response to Brief filed
04/17/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/14/1961Brief in Support of Petition
04/13/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/12/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/11/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/11/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/11/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/10/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/06/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/05/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/04/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/23/1961Motion for Rehearing
03/23/1961Errata Filed
03/21/1961Motion for RehearingIntervenor
12/22/1959Reply to Response
12/14/1959Response to Brief filed
12/10/1959Response to Brief filed
11/30/1959Supplemental Brief filed
11/25/1959Response to Brief filed
11/07/1959Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/09/1959Appellees' Brief filed
10/09/1959Appellees' Brief filed
10/09/1959Brief on the MeritsIntervenor
07/28/1959Supplemental Brief filed
07/28/1959Appellant's Brief filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/09/1961Motion for Rehearing
06/09/1961Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
05/31/1961Dissenting opinion issued.
05/15/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/09/1961Response to Brief filed
05/03/1961Brief in Support of Petition
05/01/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/21/1961Response to Brief filed
04/17/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/14/1961Brief in Support of Petition
04/13/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/12/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/11/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/11/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/11/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/10/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/06/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/05/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/05/1961Response to Motion filed
04/04/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/23/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/23/1961Errata Filed
03/21/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/08/1961Opinion issued
12/22/1959Reply to Response
12/14/1959Response to Brief filed
12/10/1959Response to Brief filed
11/30/1959Supplemental Brief filed
11/25/1959Response to Brief filed
11/07/1959Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/09/1959Appellees' Brief filed
10/09/1959Appellees' Brief filed
10/09/1959Brief on the Merits
07/28/1959Supplemental Brief filed
07/28/1959Appellant's Brief filed
05/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
James A. Baker III, L. E. Frazier, Jr., Harry R. Jones Andrews, Kurth, Campbell and BradleyAmicus Curiae
Bright and SchiffAppellee
W. G. Darsey, Jr., Joe T. Darsey and Walter R. KochIntervenor
Gordon Grasty and H. L. PooleAmicus Curiae
Atlantic Refining Company, et al.Appellant
North Texas Oil and Gas AssociationAmicus Curiae
Edward J. DrakeAmicus Curiae
Texas Landowners and Independent Oil and Gas Producers AssociationAmicus Curiae
Logue and Patterson, et al.Amicus Curiae
Bright and Schiff, et al.Appellee
Railroad Commission of TexasAppellee
Tex-Star Oil and Gas CorporationAmicus Curiae
Bryan W. Payne, L. C. Johnston, Enes M. Burt, M. D. BryantAmicus Curiae
Willis JarrelAmicus Curiae
Preston E. Johnson and A. J. Hartel, IIIAmicus Curiae
William PettyAmicus Curiae
Claire Benz Stoddard and J. D. PickettAmicus Curiae
Bennett L. Woolley, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information