judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7361
A-7361
05/27/1959
Application for Writ of Error
MISSOURI-KANSAS-TEXAS RAILROAD COMPANY OF TEXAS
LETHAL MONTGOMERY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/04/1960Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
08/04/1959Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/18/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
05/27/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/04/1960Supplemental Brief filed
08/07/1959Response to Motion filed
08/04/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/18/1959Response to Petition
05/27/1959Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/27/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Missouri-Kansas-Texas Railroad Company of TexasPetitioner
Lethal Montgomery, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information