Case: 04-16-00029-CV
04-16-00029-CV
01/19/2016
Divorce
Linda Salas Pollok
Marcel Andrew Pollok
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/02/2016 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
05/11/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
05/11/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
04/11/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2017 | Telephone call received | | |||||
12/07/2016 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
09/28/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed/Reversed & Rendered |
| ||||
09/13/2016 | Submitted | | |||||
07/29/2016 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||
06/07/2016 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
06/02/2016 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
06/01/2016 | Order entered |
| |||||
06/01/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
05/31/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||
05/11/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
05/11/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
05/11/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||
05/11/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
05/10/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
04/11/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
03/23/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
03/22/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
03/14/2016 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
02/24/2016 | Reporters record filed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/22/2016 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
02/10/2016 | Prescreened | | |||||
02/09/2016 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
01/27/2016 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
01/21/2016 | Fee paid | | |||||
01/19/2016 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
01/19/2016 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
01/19/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
01/13/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
12/28/2015 | Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed | | |||||
12/16/2015 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/07/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/07/2022 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Pollok, Linda Salas | Appellant | Katie Pearson Klein Elizabeth Turco William Daniel Mount Jr. |
Pollok, Marcel Andrew | Appellee | William A. Dudley |
Trial Court Information
79th Judicial District Court
Jim Wells
Honorable Michael Ventura Garcia
92-11-31, 307-CV
Kimberly Grigg