judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7391
A-7391
06/16/1959
Application for Writ of Error
OSCAR G. LONGORIA
AURORA VILLARREAL LONGORIA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/05/1959Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/01/1959Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/22/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
06/16/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/06/1959Response to Motion filed
08/05/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/22/1959Opinion issued
07/01/1959Reply to Response
06/22/1959Response to Petition
06/16/1959Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Oscar G. LongoriaPetitioner
Aurora Villarreal LongoriaRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information