judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WISENBAKER (LARRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38148
Short Caption:WISENBAKER (LARRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35726
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C159412Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/08/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11544
07/09/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 11, 2001. Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 01-11545
08/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required documents. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14584
09/18/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 11, 2001. To Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 01-15770
09/18/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Supreme Court Order of August 28, 2001. 01-15771
11/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 18, 2001, appellant's counsel file a transcript request form and a response to our August 28, 2001, order, and asserts that he submitted, under separate cover, the docketing Statement. To date this court has not received the docketing statement. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against appellant's counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 01-19243
11/29/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-19984
12/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. to Docketing Statement. 01-20195
12/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. to Request for Transcripts. 01-20197
12/14/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for an Enlargement of time in Which to file the Opening Brief and Appendix. 01-21056
01/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 14, 2001. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by February 6, 2002. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Our review of the district court docket entries indicates that court reporter Tina Smith filed the original transcript in the district court on june 28, 2001, prior to the docketing of this appeal in this court. Appellant should have filed with this court a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested and should include the transcript in the appendix.See NRAP 9(a); NRAP 10(a); and NRAP 30(b)(1). We waive these requirements because the transcript has been filed with this court. 02-00948
02/13/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 02/06/02. 02-02846
02/13/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-02847
03/07/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. Signed by: James Tufteland. 02-04169
03/07/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-04170
04/24/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
10/08/2002Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
11/21/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 02-20061
12/17/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-20357
12/17/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/30/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 19, 2002. 02-20357