judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALVIN DARRELL SMITH V. JOAN JOHNSON, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1038
Short Caption:ALVIN DARRELL SMITH V. JOAN JOHNSON, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5484-07Filed Date:08/11/2010

Opening Event Date:08/11/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/24/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/25/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlvin Darrell Smith YPro SeN
AppelleeJoan Johnson NPro SeN
AppelleeGladys Johnson NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/11/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (Amended NOA filed on 8/27/10 to include the 11/6/09 ruling of the trial court)
09/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 11, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
09/30/2010RECEIVED Appellant's Motion for Appeal Transcript filed in Superior Court. (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for proceeding dates from 8/8/07 to 7/9/10) (elp)
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (3-pgs/tape 11/16/07 proc.)
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (2-pgs/tape 12/21/07 proc.) w/cd
11/23/2010APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to file an opposition to Superior Court Judge's order of 11/5/10
11/24/2010RECORD INDEX
11/24/2010RECORD COPIES
11/24/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
01/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/18/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
03/01/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix were filed with this court ona January 18, 2011, and it further appearing that the brief of appellees was due to be filed on or before February 22, 2011, (See D.C. App. R. 31), but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellees shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC) elp
03/29/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 1, 2011, which directed appellees to submit their brief within 20 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, but it appearing that the brief has not yet been filed, it is ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on appellant's brief alone. (ETW) elp
03/29/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
08/08/2011FiledChange Of Address Received From Alvin Darrell Smith #05828-007, Unit 4A 224 Box 5300, USP Adelanto, CA 92301-5155 (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/25/2011FiledSubmitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Oberly,Schwelb
11/15/2011FiledReversed And Remanded (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, senior Judge.)
12/12/2011FiledMandate