judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CITY TOWING VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34820
Short Caption:CITY TOWING VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32968 , 33452 , 33959 , 34150
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A373467Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/13/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Prohibition, Mandamus or Other Appropriate Relief from an Order of the District Court Denying Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment. 99-08630
09/13/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Alverson firm-check no. 18310.
09/14/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit of the party beneficially interested. Due Date: 10 days 99-08676
10/04/1999Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition, Mandamus or other Appropriate Relief from an Order of the District Court Denying Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment. 99-09504
10/11/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing of Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition, Mandamus or Other Appropriate Relief 99-09791
11/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-10699
11/22/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Real Parties in Interest, Rosalva Diaz, et al., Against Issuance of Writ of Prohibition, Mandamus or Other Appropriate Relief Requested by Petitioner City Towing d/b/a Quality Towing. 99-11612
12/06/1999MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Request for Leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs'/Real Parties in Interest Answer to Petition pursuant to NRS 34.260. 99-12152
06/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-10027
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-11807
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.