Case: 02-16-00038-CR
02-16-00038-CR
02/02/2016
Driving While Intoxicated
Jeremy Wayne Rozell
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/16/2016 | Mandate issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
07/21/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
07/21/2016 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/20/2016 | Submitted | | |||||
06/28/2016 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||||
06/06/2016 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
04/15/2016 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/11/2016 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
02/02/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/16/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Don Schnebly |
Rozell, Jeremy Wayne | Criminal - Appellant | Abe Factor |
Trial Court Information
43rd District Court
Parker
Honorable Craig Towson
CR12-0567
Court Reporter, 43rd District Court, Parker County
3 Yrs. IDTDCJ