judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS TEKLE V. COLONIAL PARKING

Case Information: 10-AA-1026
Short Caption:THOMAS TEKLE V. COLONIAL PARKINGClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01372-10Filed Date:08/23/2010

Opening Event Date:08/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/13/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/16/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/03/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerThomas Tekle YPro SeN
RespondentColonial ParkingN
Julienne W. Bramesco YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/23/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
08/23/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
08/27/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to July 22, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
08/27/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
10/04/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 27, 2010, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
10/07/2010APPEARANCE - of Julienne W. Bramesco on respondent
12/30/2010RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcripts
12/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/25/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 6, 2011, directing petitioner to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of petitioner and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
03/01/2011RECEIVED- petitioner's brief no motion filed sent back
03/16/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
03/16/2011RECEIVED - petitioner's brief (no appendix filed)
03/16/2011RECEIVED - brown envelope w/pictures (does not comply with DCCA Rule 30 - not served, returned to petitioner)
04/06/2011ORDER GRANTING PTNR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief is filed. It is (MORE)
04/06/2011 F/O that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the appendix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's brief shallbe filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (JAC)
04/06/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
04/18/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX
04/18/2011RECEIVED - appendix
05/16/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for leave to file the lodged limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's motion is granted and the lodged limited appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
05/16/2011APPENDIX
06/13/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
06/13/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/23/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/16/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Reid, Belson
01/12/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
02/03/2012FiledMandate