Case: 14-19-00556-CV
14-19-00556-CV
07/16/2019
Contract
Sally Blackie-Sengel, Starry Skies Ranch, L.P., and Jo ARC Resources, Inc.
Ray Adrejczak and Walt Schoenvogel Atlantis Poolscapes and Custom Floors of Brenham, Inc.
No
1st Court of Appeals
08/27/2019
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/27/2019 | Case stored | | |||||
08/27/2019 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | | ||||
08/27/2019 | Order entered |
| |||||
08/26/2019 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
08/26/2019 | Record due | | |||||
08/23/2019 | Letter filed |
| |||||
08/22/2019 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
08/08/2019 | Response due | | |||||
08/05/2019 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | | |||||
07/31/2019 | Fee paid |
| |||||
07/31/2019 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||
07/31/2019 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
07/29/2019 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||
07/26/2019 | Court fee due | | |||||
07/23/2019 | Letter filed |
| |||||
07/22/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/16/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
07/16/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
07/16/2019 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
07/05/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
06/26/2019 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/27/2019 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MCT Sheet Metal Inc. | Unknown | John Emory Pipkin |
Moeller Electric and D-L Peiper, LLC | Unknown | Christopher Charles Garcia |
South Central Concrete | Unknown | David Loveless |
Naylor's Wood Floors, LLC | Unknown | Craig Shivers Jr. |
Sally Blackie-Sengel, Starry Skies Ranch, L.P., and Jo ARC Resources, Inc. | Appellant | Stuart Neil Wilson Jason B. Ostrom |
Ray Adrejczak and Walt Schoenvogel Atlantis Poolscapes and Custom Floors of Brenham, Inc. | Appellee | Noel Anne Lewandos |
Chappell Hill Construction, Inc. | Unknown | Wayne T. Rife Patrick Nichols Smith |
Foundation Building Materials, LLC d/b/a MCS Dorr & Hardware | Unknown | Trice Ragon Richey |
Trial Court Information
335th District Court
Washington
Honorable Judge, 335th District Court
36211