judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00491-CR
05-82-00491-CR
04/19/1982
Burglary of a Habitation
Roger Louise Coffer
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/21/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
06/17/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
11/15/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/06/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/10/1982Reporters record filed
08/10/1982Clerks record filed
07/02/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
04/19/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/17/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Coffer, Roger LouiseCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 2
F81-32741-KNI
22 years, TDC