Case: 14-16-00094-CV
14-16-00094-CV
02/05/2016
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Gregory Samuels
BrightPoint North America
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/16/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
03/16/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
03/14/2016 | Record due | | |||||||
03/08/2016 | Case stored | | |||||||
03/08/2016 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
03/08/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||||
03/08/2016 | Motion to dismiss disposed | GRANTED | | ||||||
03/08/2016 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
03/07/2016 | Submitted | | |||||||
03/07/2016 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
03/04/2016 | Response due | | |||||||
02/24/2016 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
02/23/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
02/23/2016 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
02/20/2016 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
02/20/2016 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||||
02/15/2016 | Court fee due | | |||||||
02/05/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
02/05/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
02/05/2016 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
01/20/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
01/14/2016 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/08/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored |
03/08/2022 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Samuels, Gregory | Appellant | Joseph R. Willie, II Gregory Samuels |
BrightPoint North America | Appellee | John Totz |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
Honorable Judge, County Civil Court At Law No. 3
751956
Laura Cutherell