judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00096-CV
08-82-00096-CV
04/21/1982
Mandamus
Burton, Rodney D., et al
Bridges, Sadler, Trustee
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1984Shuck purged
10/27/1983Mandate Issued
08/10/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/17/1983Submission
06/17/1983Submitted
03/01/1983Case ready to be set
10/06/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/27/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
09/16/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/01/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Denied
09/01/1982No description available.No description available.
07/15/1982No description available.
06/23/1982Submission
05/10/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
05/05/1982No description available.
05/05/1982No description available.
05/03/1982Bond Filed - Amended, HC, etc.
04/28/1982Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus
04/28/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/28/1982Order enteredNo description available.
04/28/1982Writ in original proceeding issuedNo description available.
04/21/1982No description available.
04/20/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/06/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownRespondent
UnknownRelator
Trial Court Information